Governing document HOUSING ACTION LTD.
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/03/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND OR SUPPORT (EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY) OF THOSE PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE HOMELESS, ABOUT TO BECOME HOMELESS, IN HOUSING NEED OR LIVING IN SUB-STANDARD ACCOMMODATION OR WHO ARE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF CIRCUMSTANCES RELATING TO THESE CONDITIONS. (THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE THE WHOLE OF EAST ANGLIA AND THE AREA OF INFLUENCE WILL BE THE UNITED KINGDOM)
Area of benefit
EAST ANGLIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.