THE LAURA CASE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LAURA CASE WAS IN UGANDA WORKING AT A HOSPITAL AS A MEDIC WHEN SHE WAS KILLED IN 2007 AGED 24. THE TRUST, SET UP BY FAMILY AND FRIENDS, SUPPORTS PROJECTS SHE WOULD HAVE FELT IMPORTANT. THESE WILL BE IN MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL FIELDS, MAINLY IN AFRICA, AND WILL BE THE SORT OF PROJECT WHERE COMPARATIVELY SMALL AMOUNTS OF MONEY WILL HAVE A SIGNIFICANT EFFECT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELISSA CASE | Chair | 21 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
Ben Connah | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Amey | Trustee | 09 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kate Sturgeon | Trustee | 22 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA ELIZABETH GYLES | Trustee | 23 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MEIRION GYLES | Trustee | 23 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
DR NICOLA RICHMOND | Trustee | 23 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
DESPINA TSATSAS | Trustee | 23 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
MRS A CASE | Trustee | 21 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
MR D CASE | Trustee | 21 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
DR D MOOR | Trustee | 21 March 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.54k | £30.17k | £8.09k | £58.66k | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.08k | £28.31k | £47.22k | £95.28k | £43.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY IN THE STUDY OF MEDICINE AND RELATED SUBJECTS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER BENEFICIAL INCLUDING THE FUNDING OF TEACHING AND RESEARCH, THE PUBLICATION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OR TO STUDENTS OF MEDICINE AND RELATED SUBJECTS, THE PROVISION OR FUNDING OF EQUIPMENT OR FACILITIES AT SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, UNIVERSITIES, HOSPITALS OR MEDICAL RESEARCH INSTITUTIONS OR THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES CARRYING OUR SUCH OBJECTS. 3.2 TO SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND RELIEF OF DISEASE AND DISABILITY BY PROVIDING EXTRA FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT AT SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, UNIVERSITIES, HOSPITALS OR RESEARCH INSTITUTIONS OR BY MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES CARRYING OUT SUCH OBJECTS OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
36A ALLCROFT ROAD
LONDON
NW5 4NE
- Phone:
- 07973515833
- Website:
-
thelauracastrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window