SUSSEX COUNTY SPORTS PARTNERSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote increased community participation in sport and active recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£856,384
Donations and legacies | £691.11k | |
Charitable activities | £147.00k | |
Other trading activities | £12.97k | |
Investments | £5.31k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£849,598
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £849.60k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £836,120 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £849.60k | |
Retained for future use | £6.79k |
People

13 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 December 2007: Standard registration
- ACTIVE SUSSEX (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Gibbons | Chair | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Yvonne Louise Rees | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Beverley Banton | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Curgenven | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Graddon | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Da Cunha | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stefania Rosso | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Diana Whitney | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Traynor | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alex White | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Pendlington | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas James Howell | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £744.92k | £1.01m | £958.26k | £991.35k | £856.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £711.55k | £836.13k | £1.11m | £1.11m | £849.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £683.53k | £992.54k | £894.51k | £977.91k | £836.12k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £342.16k | £340.45k | £372.77k | £499.62k | £691.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £41.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.97k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £359.95k | £654.09k | £574.04k | £478.30k | £147.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.50k | £560 | £47 | £664 | £5.31k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £13.98k | £11.40k | £12.77k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £711.55k | £836.13k | £1.11m | £1.11m | £849.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.14k | £8.91k | £7.87k | £29.68k | £40.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £475.57k | £149.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £507 | £11.70k | £10.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £817.51k | £1.02m | £803.45k | £736.98k | £737.79k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£97.00k | -£333.00k | -£115.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £94.63k | £122.16k | £63.13k | £122.10k | £114.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE INCREASED COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SUSSEX IN PARTICULAR BY (A) STRATEGIC PLANNING AND COORDINATION WITHIN AND BETWEEN LOCAL ORGANISATIONS OR COMMUNITY SPORTS NETWORKS, INCLUDING THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS IN THE MANAGEMENT AND PROJECT PLANNING OF SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION; (B) THE MARKETING AND COMMUNICATION OF SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION INFORMATION AND OPPORTUNITIES; (C) THE BENEFITS AND OUTCOMES OF INVESTMENT IN SPORTS AND ACTIVE RECREATION THROUGH ROBUST PERFORMANCE MEASUREMENT SYSTEMS; (D) THE SUPPORT OF ORGANISATIONS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN HELPING PEOPLE START STAY AND SUCCEED IN SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION TO WHATEVER LEVEL THEY CHOOSE; (E) THE AWARENESS OF COMMUNITY SPORTS ORGANISATIONS OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER RESOURCES WHICH ARE OPEN TO THEM; (F) THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF ALL PEOPLE, BOTH VOLUNTARY OR PROFESSIONAL, INVOLVED IN THE COMMUNITY SPORT INFRASTRUCTURE; (G) THE IMPROVEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AND ACTIVE RECREATION; (H) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN 3 (A) TO (G) ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACTIVE SUSSEX
Sussex Innovation Centre
Science Park Square
Falmer
BRIGHTON
BN1 9SB
- Phone:
- 01273643869
- Email:
- info@activesussex.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window