CENTRE FOR RESEARCH IN EARLY CHILDHOOD IN BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and carry out for public benefit, research into issues relevant to early childhood provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 December 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Lucy King | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Roberts | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Claire Thompson | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Slinn | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Bennett | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Trivett | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ROSEMARY MOYLETT | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.06k | £10.24k | £51 | £51 | £349 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.90k | £19.54k | £8.93k | £8.93k | £9.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, RESEARCH INTO ISSUES RELEVANT TO EARLY CHILDHOOD PROVISION AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Thomas Childrens Centre
Bell Barn Road
Birmingham
B15 2AF
- Phone:
- 01214640020
- Email:
- ENQUIRIES@CREC.CO.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window