ETHIOPIAN WOMEN'S EMPOWERMENT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides the following activities. (1) Employability project:- for refugee women providing jobsearch skills, interview techniques information session and holding an open day. (2) Coffee morning:- to alleviate isolation and strengthen the social bondage amongst refugee women. (3) Homework club:- to equip refugee children with maths and english skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATAN DANIEL Accountant | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hafsa MUHAMMED | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ASHA HUSSEN | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TABASSAM SHABBIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.35k | £206.74k | £206.74k | £28.51k | £62.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.17k | £108.30k | £126.78k | £58.28k | £77.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 JULY 2007 AND 15 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ETHIOPIAN AND OTHER WOMEN IN NEED THEREOF WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THE COMMUNITY 2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF ETHIOPIAN WOMEN IN NEED THEREOF WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF HEALTH INFORMATION AND ADVICE. 3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN ETHIOPIA BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, TRAINING, SUPPORT AND FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ethiopian Women's Empowerment Group
Unit 7
Office 8
Thorpe Close
London
- Phone:
- 02089645325
- Email:
- eweglondon@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window