Financial history AL-ZAHRA FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1122126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £51.95k £51.88k £57.86k £133.59k £67.83k
Total expenditure £37.26k £37.31k £55.51k £103.85k £72.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A