GIFTS TO GAMBIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
collection of educational equipment to distribute to schools in gambia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- The Gambia
Governance
- 17 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Clancy | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Kibaja | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bailey | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Georgina Bailey | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | £500 | £500 | £500 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £500 | £500 | £500 | £120 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 April 2021 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE GAMBIA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GIFTS OF SCHOOL AND HOSPITAL EQUIPMENT WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS
Area of benefit
GAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
178 CROMFORD ROAD
LANGLEY MILL
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 4EX
- Phone:
- 01773761911
- Email:
- giftstogambia@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
giftstogambia.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window