REDEARTH EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We train and provide in school support to teachers in methods to develop good practice in teaching and learning. We currently run an Achievement Award linked to the training we provide, a Lead Teacher Programme for future sustainability and an Early Reading Programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Uganda
Governance
- 12 June 2007: Standard registration
- REDEARTH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Nichola Newbold | Chair | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Rolfe | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Smith | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ronnie Katzler | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Linda Irene Pritchard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anita Diane Cosgrove | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.10k | £78.67k | £175.74k | £95.62k | £108.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.39k | £88.94k | £83.90k | £203.26k | £120.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF TEACHERS IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD, SPECIFICALLY UGANDA THROUGH TRAINING COURSES 2 TO ENHANCE AND IMPROVE THE EDUCATIONAL EXPERIENCES OF CHILDREN IN UGANDA 3 TO ADVANCE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES IN RURAL DISTRICTS BY BUILDING AND EQUIPPING A "RESOURCE CENTRE" (THIS IS NOT REQUIRED OF THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
UGANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pound House
Hope Under Dinmore
Leominster
Herefordshire
United Kingdom
HR6 0PR
- Phone:
- 07932654903
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window