Accounts and annual returns CAP FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1119670
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 30 December 2016 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required