Accounts and annual returns PEPYS COMMUNITY FORUM'S

Charity number: 1121544
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required