Financial history PEPYS COMMUNITY FORUM'S

Charity number: 1121544
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.23k £32.55k £16.05k £33.12k £41.07k
Total expenditure £19.17k £20.42k £11.96k £19.09k £42.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £7.45k £9.77k £14.99k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.00k £14.99k