REBUILD, THE LIMB RECONSTRUCTION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE UNDERGOING LIMB RECONSTRUCTION SURGERY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 May 2007: Standard registration
- THE KCH LIMB RECONSTRUCTION TRUST (Previous name)
- THE KCH LIMB RECONSTRUCTION TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lena Pearson-Wood | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Wyatt | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Elston Hooper | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aaron Saini | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Hallett | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Gee | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Roberts | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Toby Colegate Stone | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE BOND | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME GROOM | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL FLINTOFF | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH PHILLIPS | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.49k | £6.89k | £13.65k | £15.19k | £10.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.66k | £6.47k | £16.03k | £9.87k | £30.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 January 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 20 January 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PATIENTS REQUIRING LIMB RECONSTRUCTION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, SERVICES, SUPPORT, RESEARCH, EDUCATION, AND ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL
Orthopaedic Dept
Hambledon Wing East. DENMARK HILL
LONDON
SE5 9RS
- Phone:
- 020 3299 9000
- Email:
- info@klrt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window