Trustees ANGELS AND MONSTERS

Charity number: 1120305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
garry scrivens Chair 30 August 2019
None on record
emily conway Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record
caroline malcherczyk Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record
richard churcher Trustee 26 August 2022
None on record
charlotte north Trustee 31 August 2018
None on record
kelly marshall Trustee 24 August 2017
None on record
stevie paula prosser Trustee 14 August 2013
None on record
CLAIRE LOUISE gray Trustee
None on record