Governance REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) HOLY GHOST ZONE COVENTRY
Charity Number: 1127576

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 19 January 2009: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 April 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 December 2014: Re-registered
- 16 June 2016: Funds received from 1110324 REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HOLY GHOST ZONE (...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.