Financial history ACT ONE

Charity number: 1121133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.73k £3.08k £19.60k £18.43k £29.70k
Total expenditure £14.77k £6.48k £20.51k £18.80k £23.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £900 N/A N/A N/A N/A