ACT ONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACT One is an amateur musical theatre group based in Shepshed, near Loughborough, Leics. As an independent youth theatre we aim to cater for young people from school years 6 - 13 from the local area, and their interest in musical theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 October 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY MARY SPENCER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Natalie Savage | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hancock | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sian Powell | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth North | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Starkey | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN NICHOLAS SPENCER | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN STARKEY | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORNA NORTH | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ROBERT WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN PHILIP DOBSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHELLE TINA WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.73k | £3.08k | £19.60k | £18.43k | £29.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.77k | £6.48k | £20.51k | £18.80k | £23.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 MAY 2010 as amended on 08 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN CHARNWOOD, LEICESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND THE ARTS; AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
CHARNWOOD, LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 COOMBE CLOSE
SHEPSHED
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 9HH
- Phone:
- 01509821314
- Email:
- backstage@act-one.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window