CHIVERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chivers Trust supports projects which provide live musical, theatrical or visual arts experiences to young people living in Norfolk and Suffolk. Priority is given to funding projects which target the most disadvantaged groups, and work to reach new audiences, especially groups who may not otherwise have access to the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 May 2007: Standard registration
- CHIVERS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE MARY KENNEDY CHIVERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stash Timothy Horace Jonathan Kirkbride | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA JENKINS | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY FLOYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY BATTYE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.28k | £25.63k | £28.95k | £18.09k | £59.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.97k | £11.03k | £19.27k | £27.65k | £30.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHIVERS TRUST
CASTLE CHAMBERS
OPIE STREET
NORWICH
NR1 3DP
- Phone:
- 01603 612178
- Email:
- info@chiverstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window