A PLACE FOR ME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our object is to support the ME/CFS community by provision of ME-Appropriate housing, supported by a Specialist ME Carer Service, for people living in the community. We will do this by campaigning, fundraising, researching the need and developing this provision. We will also develop an ME respite care provision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 July 2007: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76 | £10 | £11 | £5 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £159 | £199 | £0 | £50 | £14.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 19 August 2019 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 09 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 11 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE DISABLED BY ME/CFS AND RESIDENT IN THE UK BY PROVIDING SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED HOUSING AND ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS, THUS IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. B) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE DISABLED BY ME/CFS AND RESIDENT IN THE UK, TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY WITHIN THE COMMUNITY, BY THE PROVISION OF CARERS (ON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS) AND BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO SUCH CARERS. C) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE WITH ME/CFS OR THOSE CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH ME/CFS WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH EITHER: I) THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANTS OR II) THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION IN ADAPTED HOUSING TO THOSE WITH ME/CFS AND THE SHORT-TERM PROVISION OF CARERS WHILE THEY ARE RESIDENT IN THIS ACCOMMODATION. D) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE LIFESTYLE, HOUSING AND CARE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH ME/CFS IN THE UK. ALL USEFUL RESULTS FROM THIS RESEARCH WILL BE DISSEMINATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window