SALAAM SHALOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK's first Muslim-Jewish media project. Salaam Shalom now delivers projects across communities. Through using tools of Dialogue, Informal Education, Media and the Arts, Salaam Shalom aims to- + Prevent Conflict and Discrimination + Challenge Prejudice + Build Bridges Between Communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 October 2007: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 17 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1175728 NISA-NASHIM
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.14k | £178 | £0 | £4.00k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.05k | £3.06k | £1.04k | £2.20k | £3.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 May 2021 | 109 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 21 APR 2021
Charitable objects
The Charity's Objects are to advance education and mutual understanding of the distinctive features and common aspects of Jewish and Muslim culture and practices; in particular, but not exclusively, by promoting and enabling dialogue and collaboration between Muslim and Jewish communities as well as combatting anti-Semitism, Islamophobia and other forms of prejudice within and between these communities and in the wider public in Bristol, the South West of England, and beyond.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL, THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window