Financial history FRIENDS OF PETER GLADWIN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1124277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.34k £7.45k £11.35k £10.84k £7.99k
Total expenditure £1.98k £3.43k £12.28k £11.31k £11.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A