Accounts and annual returns ST AIDAN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND ACADEMY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1120646
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 02 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 02 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 11 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 07 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 16 November 2009 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 29 December 2008 On Time