THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE BOSCASTLE MUSEUM OF WITCHCRAFT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the activities of the Boscastle Museum of Witchcraft
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 10 July 2007: Standard registration
- 11 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.66k | £6.08k | £7.79k | £7.51k | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £5.09k | £4.49k | £7.46k | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BOSCASTLE MUSEUM OF WITCHCRAFT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE MUSEUM') IN CO-OPERATION WITH ITS MANAGEMENT AND STAFF.
Area of benefit
BOSCASTLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window