THE HMS BEAGLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and further develop the trust's scientific and educational work by chartering or acquiring a suitable HMS Beagle lookalike sailing ship to work with on an interim basis, while continuing to pursue the raising of funds for a new ship with inbuilt educational and research programmes to encourage aspirant scientists and strengthen interest in evolutionary history and scientific discovery
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 2008: Standard registration
- THE H.M.S BEAGLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Pietro Spanu | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Peter Oliver | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Lort-Phillips | Trustee | 11 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR I D CAMPBELL | Trustee | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON BOXHALL | Trustee | 13 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID OWEN JOHN SHOUBRIDGE LORT-PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £997 | £4.26k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32k | £1.12k | £3.53k | £300 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 July 2024 | 428 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 July 2024 | 793 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 July 2024 | 1158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 23 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN: 3.1 THE SCIENCE OF BIOLOGY AND THE SKILLS AND TECHNIQUES OF SCIENTIFIC OBSERVATION; 3.2 THE LIFE AND WORK OF CHARLES DARWIN AND THE DEVELOPMENT AND UNDERSTANDING OF NATURAL HISTORY AND THE LIFE SCIENCES; 3.3 THE SKILLS OF SEAMANSHIP AND SAILING AND; 3.4 TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH IN BIO-DIVERSITY AND CLIMATE CHANGE AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rose Hill
Lawrenny
KILGETTY
Dyfed
SA68 0PW
- Phone:
- 01646651524
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window