THE HAJI GHULAM NABIR AND HAJAN ALLAH RAKHI EDUCATION AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity undertakes humanitarian and social work in South Wales which empowers local communities and individuals enhancing social cohesion. The relief of financial hardship of people living in Pakistan by providing monetary grants or providing items, services or facilities. To advance the religion of Islam. To advance the education of the poor and underprivileged, particularly girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newport City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 31 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M RAMZAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED RIAZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HASSAQ NABIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.74k | £15.82k | £15.14k | £27.77k | £32.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £45.39k | £52.21k | £19.43k | £19.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 373 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 September 2022 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2023 | 738 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2023 | 738 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED 20 JUNE 2007 AND 16 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN PAKISTAN BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 2 TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HOLY QUARAN AND TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MOHAMMED (PBUH). 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MEDICINE.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
52-54 STOW HILL
NEWPORT
NP20 1JG
- Phone:
- 07966761157
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window