KRIYA YOGA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the study and practice of Kriya Yoga for all, irrespective of race or religion. To provide relief and assistance to the sick and needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mahesh Patel | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hagen Rampes | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARIEL KLEIN | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK DANIEL GIVERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.37k | £27.92k | £94.99k | £31.22k | £88.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.23k | £12.72k | £46.61k | £69.67k | £78.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE TEACHINGS AND THE SCIENCE OF KRIYA YOGA BASED UPON THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF PERSONAL CONDUCT AND SERVICE TO OTHERS 3.2 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF KRIYA YOGA AS A MEANS OF PROMOTING SPIRITUAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL UPLIFTMENT TO ALL PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF THEIR CASTE OR RELIGIOUS BELIEF. 3.3 TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE SICK OR ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daws House
33-35 Daws Lane
London
NW7 4SD
- Phone:
- 0300 102 1659
- Email:
- info@kriyayogauk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window