HENLEY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ensuring that individuals do not suffer through lack of knowledge of their rights and responsibilities or of the services available to them or through an inabilility to express their needs effectively. Exercising a responsible influence on the development of social policies and services both locally and nationally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 06 June 2007: Standard registration
- 19 September 2013: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 19 September 2013: Funds transferred to 1150766 OXFORDSHIRE SOUTH & VALE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.39k | £80.48k | £76.30k | £74.89k | £73.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.40k | £77.67k | £83.60k | £76.26k | £69.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 09 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 09 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 14 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 14 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN HENLEY ON THAMES AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
HENLEY ON THAMES AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window