MONEY LIFELINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate a free, confidential debt advice and counselling service to individuals to help them sort out debt problems and manage their money. We can deal directly with creditors for clients or assist them in their dealings. We help clients plan payments they can afford, advise on benefits they might be able to claim, assist with bailiffs and help deal with legal action.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 June 2007: Standard registration
- 16 August 2021: Funds received from 1163757 LIFEPOINT CHURCH, ROOKSDOWN
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROB GOLDING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Mark Spence | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID LLEWELYN EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.38k | £7.39k | £6.03k | £2.66k | £4.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.15k | £3.42k | £2.85k | £2.78k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING - IN ACCORDANCE WITH BIBLICAL CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, VALUES AND PRACTICES - FREE DEBT ADVICE AND RELATED SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE TO ANY PERSON WHO IS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF HIS OR HER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT - IN ACCORDANCE WITH BIBLICAL CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, VALES, AND PRACTICES - OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INTO MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF PERSONAL FINANCES AND AWARENESS OF DEBT BUT EXCLUDING INVESTMENT ADVICE. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PRIMARILY THROUGH PRAYER, THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE, PERSONAL WITNESS, AND THE APPLICATION OF BIBLICAL CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, VALUES, AND PRACTICES, IN RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND IN ADVANCING EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
BASINGSTOKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sarum Hill Centre
Sarum Hill
Basingstoke
RG21 8SR
- Phone:
- 01256351026
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window