CHILDREN OF DESTINY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly Christain Church Service for member and public & Meetings at The Hackney Premises
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 22 August 2008: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 October 2015: Re-registered
- NEW HOPE IN CHRIST MINISTRY (Previous name)
- NEW VICTORY CHAPEL (Previous name)
- NEW VICTORY CHAPEL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMANUEL OGUNLEYE | Trustee | 27 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PIUS DUROJAIYE AWOWOLE | Trustee | 27 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEACONESS FLORENCE WURAOLA OMISORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.05k | £4.01k | £4.01k | £4.60k | £5.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.76k | £3.80k | £3.66k | £4.32k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULES HERETO IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE. TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS ASSOCIATIONS BY ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND BY ENCOURAGING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING. TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH EXCLUSIVELY ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND AE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 TIVOLI ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW4 6AA
- Phone:
- 07898798211
- Email:
- NEW.HICM@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window