Accounts and annual returns DURHAM HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity number: 1119995
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 12 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 August 2021 77 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 17 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window