LIFEWORKS STAFFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support marginalised people aged 14 and above, with an average IQ with Autism, ADHD, Dyspraxia, Tourette's Syndrome, mostly with mental ill health and their carers to find a sustainable lifestyle. Lifeworks Staffordshire run social and support groups for clients and carers, Leek outreach, advocacy, advice, diagnosis referrals and where possible befriending and life coaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 07 September 2007: Standard registration
- LIFEWORKS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Robson | Chair | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Fitz-Herbert | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY GIBSON | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ROBINSON | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROY GREGG | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KATHLEEN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA SHENTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.19k | £38.60k | £31.67k | £21.35k | £49.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.04k | £30.10k | £25.82k | £27.37k | £41.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.67k | £22.84k | £10.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2021 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2021 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED 13 JULY 2007 AND 6 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF MAINLY HIGH FUNCTIONING ADULTS WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM CONDITIONS (HERE AFTER REFERRED TO AS ASC'S) WITH OR WITHOUT A FORMAL DIAGNOSIS AND ASSOCIATED FAMILY, CARERS AND SIGNIFICANT OTHERS. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FUNDING/SERVICES TO ENABLE PEOPLE WITH ASC'S TO HAVE A SUSTAINABLE LIFESTYLE IN ADULTHOOD. (B) EDUCATING ALL SECTORS OFT COMMUNITY IN THE NEEDS OF ADULTS WITH ASC'S (C) PROVIDING A PERSON CENTRED APPROACH TO RISING ADULTS (14+) AND ADULTS WITH ASC'S THROUGH ASSESSMENT OF NEED, A PROFILE OF THE SERVICE USER, SOCIAL INTERPRETATION, ADVOCACY, SOCIAL AND LIFE SKILLS COACHING AND WORK MENTORING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Merrial Street
Newcastle-under-Lyme
Staffordshire
ST5 2AD
- Phone:
- 01782615222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window