Financial history TAMIL CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION (UK) TCA (UK)

Charity number: 1124627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.20k £15.75k £14.23k £14.28k £13.65k
Total expenditure £23.22k £17.20k £14.39k £14.57k £13.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A