CHRISTIANS IN SCIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising national and regional conferences; publication of a learned journal and a regular newsletter; provision of web-based and printed resources; provision of speakers for events in the general area of science and religion; responding to queries and questions from the media and from the wider public: collaboration with other charities working in related areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 October 2007: Standard registration
- CHRISTIANS IN SCIENCE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor William Clegg | Chair | 02 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr Rhoda Joy Hawkins | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Revd Dr Richard Ian Cheetham | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Simon Erik Kolstoe | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Colin James Livingstone Taylor | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Prof. Hugh Richard Rollinson | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Neville Richard Cobbe | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Jayne Bevan | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Joy Brice Lynas | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jos Moule | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.93k | £58.91k | £66.39k | £66.00k | £95.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.07k | £65.82k | £103.95k | £99.07k | £89.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2024 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2024 | 632 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2023 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE STUDY OF THE INTERACTIONS BETWEEN SCIENCE AND RELIGION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 Ashton Road
HYDE
Cheshire
SK14 4RN
- Phone:
- 07731976619
- Email:
- Gavinmsec.cis@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window