Trustees CXK

Charity number: 1120755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Marie Walshe Chair 01 March 2017
None on record
Paul Madden Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Anthony Hackney Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Graham Owen Briscoe Trustee 23 March 2023
THE BATH AND WELLS DBE TRUST
Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH STUDENTS' UNION
Received: On time
Pamela Elizabeth Watts Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
Peter John O'Brien Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Joanna Pamela Boraston Trustee 11 March 2021
THE BOWEN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Robert Rose Trustee 12 March 2020
None on record
Alexander Graeme Dykes Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
Dominic John Hilleard Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
William Vernon Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
KELLY AMBER FREEMAN Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Pauline Smith Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record