THE TONY BANKS MEMORIAL TRUST LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education in the Arts in London by the display of Art and craft in public places.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 June 2007: Standard registration
- 24 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £121 | £964 | £10.38k | £9.36k | £34.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 30 March 2015 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 21 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 20 March 2013 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN LONDON BY THE DISPLAY OF ART AND CRAFT IN PUBLIC PLACES.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window