WEST MIDLANDS GAS ALLIANCE CHARITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
local charities around within west midlands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 October 2007: Standard registration
- 13 November 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/12/2008 | 22/12/2009 | 24/12/2010 | 24/12/2011 | 24/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.98k | £13.92k | £11.24k | £13.17k | £12.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.03k | £11.45k | £15.30k | £9.70k | £15.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 December 2012 | 17 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 December 2011 | 17 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 December 2010 | 16 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 December 2009 | 11 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 December 2009 | 13 July 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JULY 2007 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SUPPORTING LOCAL SCHOOLS, YOUTH ORGANISATIONS AND HOSPITALS IN THE WEST MIDLANDS.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window