Financial history BIRTH TRAUMA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1120531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £14.26k £23.56k £35.44k £32.89k £29.11k
Total expenditure £13.85k £11.50k £19.34k £42.69k £37.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A