BIRTH TRAUMA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote perinatal mental health To promote and support research into prevention and treatment of post natal post traumatic stress disorder To promote mental and physical health around childbirth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christine Jones | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Rhodes-Kemp LLB | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN TREADWELL | Trustee | 18 August 2016 |
|
|||||
PAUL ALWAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.26k | £23.56k | £35.44k | £32.89k | £29.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £11.50k | £19.34k | £42.69k | £37.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ASSOCIATION OF ARTICLES, INCORPORATED 17 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF POST NATAL POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER AND OTHER PERSONS TRAUMATISED BY CHILDBIRTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVICE. TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION OF POST NATAL POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER AND TO RAISE AWARENESS OF IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Pentre Close
Ashton Hayes
CHESTER
CH3 8BR
- Phone:
- 07836 686564
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window