PHOENIX HOMES COLCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is the relief of hardship and the protection of persons with mental health issues or mild learning disabilities, through the provision of supported housing accommodation. We provide residents with an innovative and comprehensive service in a respectful environment. We aim to encourage and empower them and support their journey towards living an independent and fulfilled life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 25 June 2007: Standard registration
- 29 March 2021: Funds received from 245594 PHOENIX GROUP HOMES
- PHOENIX GROUP HOMES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Poole | Chair | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Dowse | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MALLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN FRANK MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN DAVID BIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Peter Cheng | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.74k | £214.24k | £194.95k | £212.02k | £223.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.46k | £172.54k | £171.15k | £181.47k | £172.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 April 2023 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 April 2023 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, OF PERSONS WHO ARE RECEIVING OR HAVE RECEIVED TREATMENT FOR MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS OR HAVE LEARNING DISABILITIES, OR THOSE PERSONS WHO ABUSE, OR HAVE ABUSED ALCOHOL BY:- (I) THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION; AND (II) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING AND OTHER DAY CARE FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
147 STRAIGHT ROAD
COLCHESTER
CO3 9DE
- Phone:
- 01206561767
- Email:
- info@phx.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window