RACE FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amatuer Football Club for Junior & Senior players
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Torfaen
Governance
- 14 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCOTT LEIGHTON JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARETH FRANCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BARRINGTON ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/06/2020 | 04/06/2021 | 04/06/2022 | 04/06/2023 | 04/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67k | £3.32k | £13.13k | £9.77k | £7.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £2.72k | £10.47k | £12.95k | £9.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £600 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL, IN THE INTERESTS FOR SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS OF THE RACE AND SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT').
Area of benefit
RACE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 LLANFACH ROAD
ABERCARN
NEWPORT
NP11 5LE
- Phone:
- 07967881706
- Email:
- raceafc@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window