THE FRIENDS OF NSPCC (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of funds by way of a grant to the National Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Children (NSPCC). The Friends of NSPCC (UK) Limited is exclusively charitable (2.1(e) of the Articles). The purposes of the NSPCC (UK Reg. Charity No.:216401) are to prevent the public and private wrongs of children and the corruption of their morals (Article 3 of the Royal Charter).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Taylor | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS 3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE 'OBJECTS') ARE THE PREVENTION F THE PUBLIC AND PRIVATE WRONGS OF CHILDREN AND THE CORRUPTION OF THEIR MORALS AND TO TAKE ACTION FOR THE ENFORCEMENT OF LAWS FOR THEIR PROTECTION, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN (UK REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 216401) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE (AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 2.1(E) OF THE ARTICLE). 3.2 THIS CLAUSE 3 MAY NOT BE AMENDED WITHOUT THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
N S P C C
NATIONAL CENTRE
42 CURTAIN ROAD
LONDON
EC2A 3NH
- Phone:
- 020 7825 2500
- Email:
- supporter@nspcc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window