Accounts and annual returns ENGLISH MUTUAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1120527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2024 03 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2023 03 March 2025 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2022 28 April 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2021 04 May 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2020 19 April 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required