KINGSTON CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information and support to disabled people. Supporting people to manage their Direct Payments or Personal Budgets, by providing employment advice, training and brokerage services. We administer a holiday grants scheme,an equipment grants scheme and a education grants scheme. We produce a newsletter three times a year. In November 2016 we began a heritage project, 'Fighting for our Lives'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £405,737 from 5 government contract(s) and £32,889 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 March 2008: Standard registration
- KCIL LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elsbeth Penny | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Monica Quinton | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kezia Elizabeth Coleman | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Batcho Notay | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Bamford | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|||||
MR LAWRIE LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.69k | £379.35k | £336.21k | £327.78k | £446.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.72k | £346.53k | £349.57k | £373.95k | £387.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £281.23k | £279.75k | £313.70k | £287.00k | £405.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.40k | £32.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2013 as amended on 06 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects (the Objects) are; (i) For the public benefit, to promote social inclusion among disabled people who are or may be socially excluded due to disability, so that they can lead independent and empowering lives: ? meeting and facilitating the support needs of disabled people in the region; ? promoting and increasing the opportunities for independent living available to disabled people in the region; ? assisting disabled people to make choices and access the services and support they may require to live and work independently in the community with appropriate support; ? supporting and empowering disabled people so that they may carry out social, volunteering and employment roles.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingston Centre for Independent Liv
Living
River Reach
31-35 High Street
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
- Phone:
- 02085469603
- Email:
- enquiries@kcil.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window