CLASP (CARING, LISTENING AND SUPPORTING PARTNERSHIP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CLASP provides self advocacy support and signposting services for people with learning disabilities who live in the Wokingham Borough. It helps members access information to promote independence, and campaigns for people with learning disabilities to have their voices heard at local and national level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £120,690 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wokingham
Governance
- 10 January 2008: Standard registration
- CLASP CARING, LISTENING AND SUPPORTING PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Broughton | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Tattersdill | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ormsby | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR HARRISON | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Peterson | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Harrison | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Chaffe | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEAN CORCORAN | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH DAVIDSON | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN ALLEN | Trustee | 09 July 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.45k | £58.11k | £76.35k | £147.42k | £175.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.13k | £54.29k | £69.11k | £116.92k | £124.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £113.12k | £120.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.49k | £46.82k | £48.18k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
3) TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED BY LEARNING DISABILITY IN WOKINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF AN ADVOCACY SERVICE FOR SAID PEOPLE AND BY FACILITATING SELF-ADVOCACY AND SELF-REPRESENTATION AMONGST SAID PEOPLE; B) ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING ACCESS TO, AND INVOLVEMENT IN, THE DELIVERY OF CARE SERVICES SPECIFICALLY AIMED AT SAID PEOPLE; C) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO PROFESSIONALS WITH AN INTEREST IN AND/OR WHO ASSIST AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH LEANING DISABILITIES; AND D) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WOKINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waterford House
Erfstadt Court
Wokingham
Berkshire
RG40 2YF
- Phone:
- 01182281801
- Email:
- admin@claspwokingham.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window