Trustees CLASP (CARING, LISTENING AND SUPPORTING PARTNERSHIP)
Charity number: 1122254

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Broughton | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Tattersdill | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ormsby | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR HARRISON | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Peterson | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Harrison | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Chaffe | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEAN CORCORAN | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH DAVIDSON | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN ALLEN | Trustee | 09 July 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.