UCARE (OXFORD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting basic, translational and clinical research into the causes, prevention and treatment of urological cancer and related conditions by developing and evaluating new technologies; providing equipment and facilities for research, of the disease and related conditions; Assisting in the provision of education for medical staff and general public, of the disease and related conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 September 2007: Standard registration
- 13 November 2024: Funds received from 1104819 DEPARTMENT OF UROLOGY OXFORDSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Mitchell | Chair | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robin Michael Patrick Frith | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Evans | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Pridham | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Kristian Miles Gietzmann | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Bryant | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Ross Leon Posnansky QC | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair David Gordon Lamb | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jay Newport | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Leslie | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Seetal Patel | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
KEN HEATHCOTE | Trustee | 16 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.67k | £96.40k | £101.87k | £102.23k | £90.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.58k | £86.54k | £98.30k | £86.31k | £82.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS IN RELATION TO THE DISEASE OF UROLOGICAL CANCER AND RELATED CONDITIONS BY: A) SUPPORTING BASIC, TRANSLATIONAL AND CLINICAL RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF THE DISEASE AND RELATED CONDITIONS; B) DEVELOPING AND EVALUATING NEW TECHNOLOGIES FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF THE DISEASE AND RELATED CONDITIONS; C) PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR RESEARCH AND TREATMENT OF THE DISEASE AND RELATED CONDITIONS; D) ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN THE DISEASE AND RELATED CONDITIONS FOR MEDICAL STAFF AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
UCARE
PO Box 677
Abingdon
OX14 9LZ
- Phone:
- 01865767777
- Email:
- ucare@ucare-oxford.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window