Accounts and annual returns CBK FOUNDATION FOR DEMOCRACY AND JUSTICE

Charity number: 1122395
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 16 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 04 March 2015 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 17 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 June 2013 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required