UPHOLLAND AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of educational, social, and recreational activities through the voluntary efforts of U3A members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
137 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Finch | Chair | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cathrine Jane Taylor | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Crickett | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Elizabeth Higgins | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Garner | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Pauline Occleshaw | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Esther Connor | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Pemberton | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Griffin | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Ann Newman | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Alan Hough | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Turton | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.35k | £9.44k | £36.26k | £62.11k | £64.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.72k | £13.86k | £34.22k | £63.09k | £61.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2015 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 31 Mar 2020 as amended on 31 Jul 2020 as amended on 14 Apr 2021 as amended on 16 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
UP HOLLAND AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CORONATION WALK
BILLINGE
WIGAN
WN5 7QE
- Phone:
- 07732 455985
- Email:
- bethturton@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window