Financial history FRIENDS OF RED OAKS

Charity number: 1120234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £8.36k £1.88k £8.26k £13.28k £13.71k
Total expenditure £2.94k £7.90k £4.46k £15.55k £9.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A