Financial history INSIGHT FOR LIVING (UK)

Charity number: 1119934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £300.61k £366.49k £245.29k £192.24k £213.91k
Total expenditure £303.18k £277.33k £274.29k £273.60k £274.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A