THE GROVE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Grove Pre-School caters for 30 children aged 3+ 4 years, 5 mornings per week and 3 afternoons(offer 30hours entitlement). We also run a toddler group catering for 25 children per week, We fundraise for our equipment and employ 5 members of staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,392 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
Governance
- 09 August 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH BAINES | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Marsh | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA KING BOOTH | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE WHITE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANE HALLIMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA CROSSMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.86k | £79.00k | £68.53k | £69.08k | £74.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.06k | £82.77k | £68.42k | £82.07k | £74.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.05k | £77.77k | £68.10k | £68.42k | £72.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROVIDE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE EDUCATIONAL AND PLAY FACILITIES IN A SAFE, FRIENDLY AND CARING ENVIRONMENT, LIVING IN GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS; AND 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF STAFF AND VOLUNTEERS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
GATESHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BIRTLEY CENTRE
HARRAS BANK
BIRTLEY
COUNTY DURHAM
DH3 2LN
- Phone:
- 01914102011
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window